Announcement Of Cessation As Executive Director
BackAug 01, 2013
Resignation Details | |
Name Of Person | Wong Kean Shyong, Kenn |
Age | 48 |
Is Effective Date Of Cessation Known? | Yes |
Effective Date Of Cessation | 01/08/2013 |
Detailed Reason(s) for Cessation | To pursue other career opportunities. |
Is there any difference of opinion on material matters between the person and the Board of directors? | No |
If yes, please elaborate | NA |
Is there any matter in relation to the cessation that needs to be brought to the attention of the shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
If yes, please elaborate | NA |
Any other relevant information to be provided to shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
If yes, please elaborate | NA |
Date of Appointment to current position | 18/01/2013 |
Job Title | Executive Director / Chief Marketing Officer |
Role and Responsibilities | Mr Wong's key responsibilities included sales strategies, business development and part of business operation. |
Does the AC have a minimum of 3 members (taking into account this resignation)? | Yes |
Number of Independent Directors currently resident in Singapore (taking into account this cessation) | 3 |
Number of Cessations of Appointments specified in Listing Rule 704(7) over the past 12 months | 1 |
Interest in the listed issuer and its subsidiaries | None |
Family relationship with any director and/or substantial shareholder of the listed issuer or of any of its principal subsidiaries | None |
Other Directorship | |
Past Directorship (for the last five years) | China Steel Case (Camp) Pte. Ltd. VSC Building Products Company Limited |
Present Directorship | Euasia Global Trading (HK) Limited |
Other Notes | |
Footnotes | Mr Wong Kean Shyong, Kenn was appointed Non-Executive Director of the Company on 15 November 2010 and was re-designated as an Executive Director on 18 January 2013. |